Hamideh et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ali Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab, Waleed Hamideh and Amr Hamideh
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02229
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [#15] Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone for Scheduling Conference in light of the Minute Order [#14] ordering the parties to appear by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on September 25, 2020. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone for Scheduling Conference by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zouski, Justin)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference set October 1, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on September 24, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab. (Malik, Saira)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Zouski, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saira P. Malik on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ali Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Amr Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Waleed Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ibraahim Saab(pty:pla) (Malik, Saira)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Zouski, Justin)
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kurt Hans Henkel on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Kurt Hans Henkel added to party Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Henkel, Kurt)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Service of Process Transmittal of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint upon The Corporation Company on 7/7/2020. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab.(jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31073. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7408800), filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Waleed Hamideh Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Amr Hamideh Demand Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zouski, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamideh et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt Hans Henkel
Represented By: Justin Hans Zouski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Hamideh
Represented By: Saira P. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibraahim Saab
Represented By: Saira P. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waleed Hamideh
Represented By: Saira P. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amr Hamideh
Represented By: Saira P. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?