Keller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Keller and Tracie Keller
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02247
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Okon, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. American Family Mutual Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond no later than 9/11/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Okon, Joseph)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. American Family Mutual Insurance Company answer due 9/8/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/25/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sandy Marie Eloranto on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Sandy Marie Eloranto added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Eloranto, Sandy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Okon, Joseph)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Keller, Tracie Keller. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Archuleta, Nathanael)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Based on Plaintiffs' filing of the #7 Notice, the 6 Minute Order striking the Amended Complaint is vacated, and the #5 Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Their First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Brian Keller, Tracie Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Archuleta, Nathanael)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: The #5 Amended Complaint, filed in violation of D.C.COLOLCivR 15.1, is STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Brian Keller, Tracie Keller.(Archuleta, Nathanael)
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Consent Form due by 9/29/2020. (ksena)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/2020. (ksena)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7411194)Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Brian Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Tracie Keller(pty:pla), filed by Brian Keller, Tracie Keller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Archuleta, Nathanael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keller
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Keller
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Represented By: Joseph Edward Okon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?