Gramith et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Gramith and Stephen O. Gramith
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Case Number: 1:2020cv02286
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(pty:dft) by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana.(Spano, Brian)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich on behalf of Elizabeth A. Gramith, Stephen O. GramithAttorney Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich added to party Elizabeth A. Gramith(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich added to party Stephen O. Gramith(pty:pla) (Goodrich, Katherine)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana answer due 9/11/2020. (White, Holly)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 10/7/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/5/2020. (ksena)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7417722)Attorney Rodney J. Monheit added to party Elizabeth A. Gramith(pty:pla), Attorney Rodney J. Monheit added to party Stephen O. Gramith(pty:pla), filed by Stephen O. Gramith, Elizabeth A. Gramith. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monheit, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gramith et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Gramith
Represented By: Rodney J. Monheit
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen O. Gramith
Represented By: Rodney J. Monheit
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Represented By: Holly C. White
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?