Pecora v. Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC
Plaintiff: Norma Mae Pecora
Defendant: Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC and Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC doing business as Sprouts Farmers Market
Case Number: 1:2020cv02304
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 August 2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/14/2020, re: #19 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. ORDERED that the Second Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 17] is hereby DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #17 by Defendant Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Johnson, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Supplement/Amendment by Defendant Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Johnson, James)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/12/2020. ORDERED that, on or before August 20, 2020, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 by Defendant Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Johnson, James)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Johnson, James)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02304-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Norma Mae Pecora All parties do not consent.. (Parker, George)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 August 2020: returnable by Defendant Sunflower Farmers Market, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market. It is ORDERED that Defendant Sunflower Farmers Market, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market shall show cause in writing on or before August 20, 2020 why the case should not be remanded to the Larimer County District Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #10 filed by attorney George Harold Parker, Jr..Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a complete signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by George Harold Parker, Jr on behalf of Norma Mae PecoraAttorney George Harold Parker, Jr added to party Norma Mae Pecora(pty:pla) (Parker, George)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Sunflower Farmers Markets on 07/14/2020. (jtorr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC, filed by Norma Mae Pecora.(jtorr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Foley Burke on behalf of Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLCAttorney Alison Foley Burke added to party Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC(pty:dft) (Burke, Alison)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC for Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Johnson, James)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC.(Johnson, James)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC from Larimer County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30458. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7419869), filed by Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pecora v. Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Represented By: Alison Foley Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunflower Farmers Markets, LLC doing business as Sprouts Farmers Market
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Represented By: Alison Foley Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Mae Pecora
Represented By: George Harold Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?