Shekhar v. Whereable Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chandra Shekhar
Defendant: Dale Mayo and Whereable Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02312
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Lindsey J. Brown attempted to enter her appearance in this case by affixing her "s/" signatures to ECF Document No. 9. A search of the court's attorney roll does not indicate Ms. Brown is a member of the court's bar. Further, the filer's name on the CM/ECF account must match the "/s/" signature for whom the login and password are registered. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5) her purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/8/2020. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Amanda L. Milgrom added to party Dale Mayo(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda L. Milgrom added to party Whereable Technologies, LLC (pty:dft) by Dale Mayo, Whereable Technologies, LLC.(Milgrom, Amanda)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to the #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time, the Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2020. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/13/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM regarding #6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Chandra Shekhar. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/12/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Chandra Shekhar. (Dodson, Penn)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale Mayo, Whereable Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7421559)Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Chandra Shekhar(pty:pla), filed by Chandra Shekhar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dodson, Penn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shekhar v. Whereable Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Shekhar
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Mayo
Represented By: Amanda L. Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whereable Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Amanda L. Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?