Whitaker v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Angela Whitaker
Defendant: Colorado Mental Health Institute Pueblo, Aspen Pointe, Kenneth Sanchez, Gabriella Petrescu and Katie Blikenderfer
Case Number: 1:2020cv02332
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Documents by Plaintiff Juanita Angela Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(evana, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 15, 2020. (rvill, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aspen Pointe, Colorado Mental Health Institute Pueblo, Kenneth Sanchez, Gabriella Petrescu, Katie Blikenderfer, filed by Juanita Angela Whitaker.(evana, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order. That, if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/20/2020. (evana, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without PrepayingFees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/7/2020.(evana, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Juanita Angela Whitaker. (jsalz, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aspen Pointe, Colorado Mental Health Institute Pueblo, Kenneth Sanchez, filed by Juanita Angela Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waivers, Notices and Summonses)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Mental Health Institute Pueblo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Pointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Blikenderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Angela Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?