Rolland, Sr. v. Aurora Retirement, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.
Defendant: Aurora Retirement, L.L.C. and Cherry Creek Retirement Village
Case Number: 1:2020cv02338
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aurora Retirement, L.L.C., filed by Ronnie R Rolland, Sr..(angar, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. If Plaintiff desires to amend his Complaint he may do so without seeking permission of the Court. Therefore, the Motion to Amend, ECF No. #11 ,is DENIED as unnecessary. The Court grants Plaintiff thirty days from the date of the instant Minute Order to file an amended complaint if he so desires. If he fails to file an amended complaint within thirty days the Court will proceed to review the merits of the Complaint, ECF No. 1, submitted to the Court on August 6, 2020, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/18/2020.(angar, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiffs First Motion to Amend his Original Complaint, by Plaintiff Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (angar, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. No answer by Defendant will be ordered until the initial review is complete, and the Court directs that the action should proceed. The Answer and Affirmative Defenses, ECF No. 9, will not be considered by the Court at this time, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/14/2020. (angar, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Aurora Retirement, LLC d/b/a Cherry Creek Retirement Village's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint Attorney Kristina Marie Wright added to party Aurora Retirement, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Aurora Retirement, L.L.C..(Wright, Kristina)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/11/2020.(angar, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, by Plaintiff Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (angar, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Exhibits, by Plaintiff Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (angar, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Plaintiff Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (angar, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/7/2020. (angar, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (jsalz, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Aurora Retirement, L.L.C., filed by Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil sheet, summons, notice and waiver)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolland, Sr. v. Aurora Retirement, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Retirement, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kristina Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Creek Retirement Village
Represented By: Kristina Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie R Rolland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?