Denver Bible Church et al v. Azar II et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads, Community Baptist Church and Denver Bible Church
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Alex M Azar II, Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jill Hunsaker Ryan, Governor Jared Polis, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of the Treasury, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Chad W. Wolf and Jared Polis
Case Number: 1:2020cv02362
Filed: August 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kuhn, W.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting #59 Joint Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference Date. The Scheduling Conference set on October 29, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. The parties are directed to jointly contact chambers, 303-335-2403, within five business days of a decision by Judge Domenico on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to set a date for the Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/5/20.(nmarb, )
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #59 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to answer and hold scheduling conference filed by Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Community Baptist Church, Joey Rhoads. The parties' request to continue the Scheduling Conference is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/4/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and taking under advisement #59 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to answer and hold scheduling conference. Federal Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint within fourteen days of the court's ruling on #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties' request to continue the Scheduling Conference is taken under advisement. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/4/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to answer and hold scheduling conference by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Messall, Rebecca)
September 30, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuhn, W.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 57 First MOTION to Supplement #1 Complaint,,,, automatically by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Messall, Rebecca)
September 18, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants and Plfs Resp to Minute Order filed by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit)(Messall, Rebecca)
September 17, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuhn, W.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #52 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Authority. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/16/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 53 Proposed Order to #52 Motion to Supplement Authority by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca) Modified on 9/16/2020 to correct event (athom, ).
September 16, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Supplement Authority re: #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Messall, Rebecca) Modified on 9/16/2020 to correct event (athom, ).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER re: #49 Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Plaintiffs' response to #50 State Defendants' Supplemental Brief should address the following questions as to each Plaintiff church: (1) What is the church's current occupancy limit for indoor worship services under the restrictions imposed by PHO 20-28 Part II(M), and what would the church's occupancy limit for indoor services be if the only restriction imposed was the six-foot social distancing requirement?; and (2) What evidence is there that attendance at the church's worship services would exceed the current occupancy limit imposed by PHO 20-28 Part II(M) if the occupancy caps, but not the six-foot social distancing requirement, were lifted? SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #49 Order,,, Requesting Supplemental Briefing by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Kuhn, W.)
September 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re: #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. On or before 9/14/2020, the State Defendants shall file a brief not to exceed 2,700 words identifying the reason(s) for imposing, in Public Health Order 20-28 or any other operative Public Health Order or Executive Order, restrictions, including occupancy limitations, on Houses of Worship that do not also apply to other Critical Businesses with public indoor spaces (e.g., Critical Retailers and elementary and secondary schools). Plaintiffs may file a response, not to exceed 2,700 words, to the State Defendants' brief on or before 9/18/2020. The parties may submit additional affidavits or documentary evidence in support of their briefs. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/7/2020. (dddlc1, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 State Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. State Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint within fourteen days of the court's ruling on #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/4/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,, by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan. (Kuhn, W.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER. Having reviewed the record and the parties' briefs, the court does not believe a preliminary-injunction hearing is necessary at this time. Should the court require any additional evidence or legal argument, it will request further written submissions from the parties. The court takes #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction under advisement and will issue a written order. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/2/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Scott Jensen w/attachments, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Robert Enyart, #3 Affidavit Affidavit Joey Rhoads, #4 Affidavit Affidavit Preston Branaugh, #5 Exhibit EO 017, #6 Exhibit EO 138, #7 Exhibit PHO 20-24, #8 Exhibit PHO 20-28, #9 Affidavit Affidavit Beau Ballentine, #10 Affidavit Affidavit James Craddock, #11 Affidavit Affidavit Jason Troyer)(Bergford, J.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 27, 2020 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition to #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants filed by Defendants Alex M Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of the Treasury, Chad W. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Turi Declaration, #2 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Turi Decl. Ex. 12)(Lynch, Jason)
August 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Witness Testimony by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan (Kuhn, W.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants filed by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kuhn, W.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Cyrus Lynch on behalf of Alex M Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of the Treasury, Chad W. WolfAttorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party Alex M Azar II(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party Steven T. Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Cyrus Lynch added to party Chad W. Wolf(pty:dft) (Lynch, Jason)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #35 State Defendants' Motion to Vacate or Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:30 AM and the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/9/2020 at 9:00 AM are VACATED. After reviewing Defendants' response(s) and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, to #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the court will determine whether to (a) set a preliminary injunction hearing, (b) request supplemental briefing from the parties on specific legal or factual questions, or (c) decide the motion on the papers submitted. The parties shall submit all direct witness testimony by affidavit as previously ordered. The deadlines for submission of proposed exhibit and witness lists, exchange of exhibits, submission of time estimates, and motions affecting any preliminary injunction hearing are VACATED. If the court determines a preliminary injunction hearing is necessary, it will be set for a VTC hearing on 9/15/2020 at 9:00 AM, with a VTC status conference on 9/14/2020 at 1:30 PM. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Vacate or Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Messall, Rebecca)
August 23, 2020 Filing 37 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads All parties do not consent.. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 22, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re #12 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Bergford, J.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Vacate or Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Defendants Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Governor Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan. (Kuhn, W.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Complaint,,,, and other documents by registered mail upon US Attorney General by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,,,,,, service upon US Attorney/AUSA Steiner by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,,,,,, service upon CO Attorney General by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service Treasury by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service DHS by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service HHS by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT service CDPHE by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of Alex M Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Chad W. WolfAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Alex M Azar II(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Steven T. Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Chad W. Wolf(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Governor Jared PolisAttorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Governor Jared Polis(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service Wolf (corrected) by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service Mnuchin by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service Azar by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca) Modified on 8/21/2020 to correct text (athom, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, service Ryan by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT service upon governor by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan K. Lorch on behalf of Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jill Hunsaker RyanAttorney Ryan K. Lorch added to party Colorado Department of Health and Environment(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan K. Lorch added to party Jill Hunsaker Ryan(pty:dft) (Lorch, Ryan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Corelle M. Spettigue on behalf of Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jill Hunsaker RyanAttorney Corelle M. Spettigue added to party Colorado Department of Health and Environment(pty:dft), Attorney Corelle M. Spettigue added to party Jill Hunsaker Ryan(pty:dft) (Spettigue, Corelle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by W. Eric Kuhn on behalf of Colorado Department of Health and Environment, Jill Hunsaker RyanAttorney W. Eric Kuhn added to party Colorado Department of Health and Environment(pty:dft), Attorney W. Eric Kuhn added to party Jill Hunsaker Ryan(pty:dft) (Kuhn, W.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. To the extent Plaintiffs request issuance of a temporary restraining order without notice to Defendants and an opportunity for Defendants to be heard, that request is DENIED. Defendants shall respond to the motion on or before 8/27/2020, and Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before 8/31/2020. #15 Plaintiffs' Motion to File a Brief Exceeding Page Limitations is GRANTED. Defendants' response to #13 Motion shall not exceed 10,300 words, and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall not exceed 4,500 words. #14 Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine is DENIED. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing on #13 Motion is SET for 9/9/2020 at 9:00 AM by video teleconference ("VTC"). Refer to the attached Order for prehearing procedures and deadlines. A VTC Status Conference is SET for 9/3/2020 at 10:30 AM to discuss procedures and logistics for the Preliminary Injunction Hearing. No parties, attorneys, witnesses, or members of the public may attend the Status Conference or the Preliminary Injunction Hearing in person. Members of the public may attend the Status Conference and the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by teleconference at (866) 390-1828, using Access Code 9792296#. All persons participating in court proceedings remotely by VTC or teleconference are prohibited, under penalty of contempt, from recording or broadcasting the proceeding in any manner. Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order no later than 8/18/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/17/2020. (dddlc1, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE Update as to Notice to Opposing Counsel by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding motion for TRO/Prelim Inj by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Messall, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION in Limine against all Defendants by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Messall, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Defendants by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #4 attorney's certificate)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Azar, Dept HHS, Wolf, Dept DHS, Mnuchin, Dept Treas, Gov Polis,Ryan, Colo Dept Health Envir re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: The #9 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued - all defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Azar, Dept HHS, Wolf, Dept DHS, Mnuchin, Dept Treas, Gov Polis,Ryan, Colo Dept Health Envir by Plaintiffs Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Messall, Rebecca)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #7 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney J. Bradley Bergford. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Bradley Bergford on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney J. Bradley Bergford added to party Community Baptist Church(pty:pla), Attorney J. Bradley Bergford added to party Denver Bible Church(pty:pla), Attorney J. Bradley Bergford added to party Robert A. Enyart(pty:pla), Attorney J. Bradley Bergford added to party Joey Rhoads(pty:pla) (Bergford, J.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12 August 2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/11/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Messall, Rebecca)
August 9, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
August 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7426955)Attorney Rebecca R. Messall added to party Community Baptist Church(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca R. Messall added to party Denver Bible Church(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca R. Messall added to party Robert A. Enyart(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca R. Messall added to party Joey Rhoads(pty:pla), filed by Community Baptist Church, Robert A. Enyart, Denver Bible Church, Joey Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Civil Cover Sheet)(Messall, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denver Bible Church et al v. Azar II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar II
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Health and Environment
Represented By: Corelle M. Spettigue
Represented By: Ryan K. Lorch
Represented By: W. Eric Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Hunsaker Ryan
Represented By: Corelle M. Spettigue
Represented By: Ryan K. Lorch
Represented By: W. Eric Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jared Polis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad W. Wolf
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Polis
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Enyart
Represented By: Rebecca R. Messall
Represented By: J. Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Rhoads
Represented By: Rebecca R. Messall
Represented By: J. Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Baptist Church
Represented By: Rebecca R. Messall
Represented By: J. Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Bible Church
Represented By: Rebecca R. Messall
Represented By: J. Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?