Pittman, Sr v. True
Petitioner: Darnell Love Pittman, Sr
Respondent: Bill True
Case Number: 1:2020cv02372
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to Applicants request in the September 30, 2020, Letter, ECF No. #10 , the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Applicant a photocopy of the Docket in this case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/2/2020. (mailed as ordered) (evana, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Darnell Pittman (evana, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #8 Order of Dismissal on September 25, 2020. (rvill, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to cure the deficiencies. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 25, 2020. (rvill, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER by Petitioner Darnell Love Pittman, Sr. (rvill, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Darnell Love Pittman, Sr. Related document: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darnell Love Pittman, Sr.(evana, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Darnell Love Pittman, Sr. (evana, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/11/2020. (angar, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Darnell Love Pittman, Sr. (jsalz, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/11/2020) (jsalz, ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Darnell Love Pittman, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/11/2020) (jsalz, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman, Sr v. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darnell Love Pittman, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?