Shetina v. Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Tonia Shetina by and through Paulette Shetina as Personal Representative and Paulette Shetina
Defendant: STORE Capital Acquisitions LLC, American Gaming Group, d/b/a Wildwood Casino, American Gaming Group, LLC a Nevada foreign limited liability company doing business as Wildwood Casino and Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02379
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02379-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff) by Defendants American Gaming Group, LLC, Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC. (Olson, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants American Gaming Group, LLC, Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Olson, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olson, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Store Capital Corporation for Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC. (Olson, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to #3 Complaint by American Gaming Group, LLC, Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC.(Olson, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant STORE Capital Acquisitions, LLC. Mr. Peck is relieved of further representation of Defendant STORE Capital Acquisitions, LLC. Ms. Olson will be added to the docket as counsel for the defendant. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/17/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Peck, Jeremy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy David Peck on behalf of Store Capital Acquisitions, LLCAttorney Jeremy David Peck added to party Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC(pty:dft) (Peck, Jeremy)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadline by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/12/2020. Consent Form due by 10/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/5/2020 (jgonz, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Scott A Sells, District Court Judge, Teller County on 08/03/2020. (alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC on 07/10/2020. (alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against American Gaming Group, LLC, Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC, filed by Paulette Shetina.(alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Gaming Group, d/b/a Wildwood Casino from Teller County District Court, Case Number 20cv30034. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7428926), filed by American Gaming Group, d/b/a Wildwood Casino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Olson, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shetina v. Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Tonia Shetina by and through Paulette Shetina as Personal Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Shetina
Represented By: Jason Glenn Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STORE Capital Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Gaming Group, d/b/a Wildwood Casino
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Gaming Group, LLC a Nevada foreign limited liability company doing business as Wildwood Casino
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Store Capital Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Represented By: Jeremy David Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?