Thompson v. Hilt et al
Plaintiff: Sanza Eugene Thompson
Defendant: Tommy Thompson, Marylyn Miller and Christina Marie Hilt
Case Number: 1:2020cv02406
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0603
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal on 09/18/2020. (athom, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiencies as directed, failed to comply with the Court's local rules, and failed to prosecute. IFP on appeal is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Leave to Proceed USC 1915" (ECF No. #3 ) is denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/18/2020. (athom, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order Addressed to Sanza Eugene Thompson. (athom, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs., #1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Sanza Eugene Thompson. (athom, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) and Complaint forms, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencywithin thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/2020. (apesa, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Sanza Eugene Thompson. (cpomm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Civil COMPLAINT against Christina Marie Hilt, Marylyn Miller, Tommy Thompson, filed by Sanza Eugene Thompson.(cpomm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2020: #1 Envelope) (cpomm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Hilt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanza Eugene Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marylyn Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Marie Hilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?