Sibley v. Mesa County Board of County Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Richard Sibley
Defendant: Lisa Peck, Mesa County Board of County Commissioners, Art Smith, Charles Bonnett and Brenda Apolinar
Case Number: 1:2020cv02407
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/7/2020. Given the recent waivers of service, the court sua sponte RESETS the following deadlines: Consent Form due by 12/22/2020; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang; and the Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/29/2020. All participants for the Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall use the dial-in information as previously ordered. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Richard Sibley. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sibley. Charles Bonnett waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sibley. Lisa Peck waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sibley. Brenda Apolinar waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sibley. Art Smith waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sibley. Mesa County Board of County Commissioners waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shaffer, Daniel)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER re: #6 Order by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/2/2020. Due to an unavoidable conflict with the court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 10/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All other deadlines remain set. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/20/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/6/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2407-NYW (angar, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock for all further proceedings and drawn to Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02407-LTB, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/13/2020. (apesa, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7433147)Attorney Daniel R. Shaffer added to party Richard Sibley(pty:pla), filed by Richard Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sibley v. Mesa County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Apolinar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sibley
Represented By: Daniel R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?