Thompson v. Fourth District El Paso County, Court Div. 17
Plaintiff: Sanza Eugene Thompson
Defendant: Fourth District El Paso County Co. Div.17
Case Number: 1:2020cv02410
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 9/17/2020. (sphil, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiencies as directed, failed to comply with the Courts local rules, and failed to prosecute. IFP on appeal is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/17/2020. (sphil, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order, Addressed to Sanza Eugene Thompson. (sphil, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Sanza Eugene Thompson. (sphil, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/2020. (sphil, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Motion For: Civil Rights Violation against Fourth District El Paso County, Co. Div. 17, filed by Sanza Eugene Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Fourth District El Paso County, Court Div. 17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanza Eugene Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth District El Paso County Co. Div.17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?