Martinez v. Mitzel
Plaintiff: Eugene F Martinez, Jr
Defendant: Mitzel, Krista Ciarlo, Michelle Brodeur, Joy Hart, C. Estep, Richard Josiah, Mark Andreis, Chance Turner, Lisa Mueller, Stephanie Martinez, Brady Hunsaker, Dean Williams, Sergio Prieto, Brock Vaughn, Lyle Kentizer and John Atcherson
Interested Party: CASE MANAGER FOR Eugene F. Martinez, Jr., #85357
Case Number: 1:2020cv02411
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Mark Andreis, John Atcherson, Michelle Brodeur, Krista Ciarlo, C. Estep, Joy Hart, Brady Hunsaker, Richard Josiah, Lyle Kentizer, Stephanie Martinez, Lisa Mueller, Sergio Prieto, Chance Turner, Brock Vaughn, Dean WilliamsAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Mark Andreis(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party John Atcherson(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Michelle Brodeur(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Krista Ciarlo(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party C. Estep(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Joy Hart(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Brady Hunsaker(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Richard Josiah(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Lyle Kentizer(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Stephanie Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Lisa Mueller(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Sergio Prieto(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Chance Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Brock Vaughn(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella on behalf of Dean Williams, Michelle Brodeur, Joy Hart, C. Estep, Mark Andreis, Krista Ciarlo, Sergio Prieto, Chance Turner, Stephanie Martinez, Lisa Mueller, John Atcherson, Lyle Kentizer, Brock Vaughn, Brady Hunsaker, Richard JosiahAttorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Michelle Brodeur(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Joy Hart(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party C. Estep(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Mark Andreis(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Krista Ciarlo(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Sergio Prieto(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Chance Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Stephanie Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Lisa Mueller(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party John Atcherson(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Lyle Kentizer(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Brock Vaughn(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Brady Hunsaker(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella added to party Richard Josiah(pty:dft) (Starnella, Kathryn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #16 to CASE MANAGER FOR Eugene F. Martinez, Jr., #85357 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 September 2020. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Preliminary Scheduling/Status Conference currently set on October 28, 2020 will commence at 2:00 p.m. that same day in the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom A-501, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Eugene F Martinez, Jr. (evana, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re 12 Order Regarding DOC Restricted Service, #1 This I a Cover Motion of Sorts, To Try to Explain Plaintiff(s) Inclosed 1983 Complaint. The Contence and Numbering of Pages for Service of Process. (jtorr, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 3: Memorandum. (jtorr, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED: (1) The United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process on defendants Mrs. Mitzel and C/O Manuel Garcia at the address indicated on the Memorandum filed under restriction contemporaneously to this Text-Only Order; (2) access to the address contained in the Memorandum shall be Restricted Level 3 Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 pending further order of the court; (3) any return of service filed concerning this defendant shall be Restricted Level 3 pending further order of the court; (4) the clerk of the court is directed to file without restriction and open to public inspection a copy of the return of service which redacts the address where service was made or attempted. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Unexecuted as to Mitzel, no longer DOC employee (evana, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #9 to CASE MANAGER FOR Eugene F. Martinez, Jr., #85357 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 August 2020. It is ORDERED that a Preliminary Scheduling/Status Conference will be held before this Court on October 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., in the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom A-501, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Plaintiff shall participate in this conference by telephone. Plaintiff and his case manager, or a representative of the facility, and any other party participating by telephone shall call the following conference line at the appointed time: Number: 888-278-0296, Access code: 8212991#. (cmadr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 This I a Cover Motion of Sorts, To Try to Explain Plaintiff(s) Inclosed 1983 Complaint. The Contence and Numbering of Pages for Service of Process. (jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 11/20/2020 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/20/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/20/2020. This case is directly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02411-CMA-MEH. (sphil, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020, re: #2 the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is GRANTED; #3 the "Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the Int[ere]st of Justic[e]" is GRANTED. (sphil, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the Intrust of Justic by Plaintiff Eugene F Martinez, Jr. (jsalz, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Eugene F Martinez, Jr. (jsalz, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 This I a Cover Motion of Sorts, To Try to Explain Plaintiff(s) Inclosed 1983 Complaint. The Contence and Numbering of Pages. against Mitzel, filed by Eugene F Martinez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Mitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Ciarlo
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Brodeur
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Hart
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Estep
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Josiah
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Andreis
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Turner
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mueller
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Martinez
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Hunsaker
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Williams
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Prieto
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Vaughn
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Kentizer
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Atcherson
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene F Martinez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CASE MANAGER FOR Eugene F. Martinez, Jr., #85357
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?