Montoya v. No Named Defendants
Plaintiff: Margaret L. Montoya
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Case Number: 1:2020cv02416
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (athom, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (rvill, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (athom, ) Modified on 9/25/2020 to add a Level 2 Restriction (athom, ).
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (athom, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (athom, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall notify the Court promptly if she is unable to obtain copies of the forms. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies as directed within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/9/2020. (apesa, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Margaret L. Montoya (apesa, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Margaret L. Montoya (apesa, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Letter, #8 Letter, #7 Letter Addressed to Margaret L. Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Doc #7, #2 Doc #8) (apesa, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Order, Addressed to Margaret L. Montoya. (apesa, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Letter Addressed to Margaret L. Montoya. (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies as directed within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/2020. (apesa, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Letter, 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Margaret L. Montoya. (apesa, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Margaret Montoya (apesa, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 LETTERS by Plaintiff Margaret L. Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 8/11/2020, #2 Letter dated 8/3/2020, #3 Letter dated 7/30/2020, #4 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret L. Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?