Lynne v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynne
Defendant: Josh Sheldon, John Feyen, Steve Johnson, David Ayraud, Troy Miller, Josh (I) Sheldon, Justin (I) Smith, John (I) Feyen, Tom Donnelly, Troy (I) Miller, Steve (I) Johnson, Justin Smith, David (I) Ayraud, John (I) Kefalas, Tom (I) Donnelly and John Kefalas
Case Number: 1:2020cv02427
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER. Due to a scheduling conflict, the Scheduling Conference set for October 28, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. is RESET to October 27, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order by October 20, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on October 8, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants David Ayraud, David (I) Ayraud, Tom Donnelly, Tom (I) Donnelly, John Feyen, John (I) Feyen, Steve Johnson, Steve (I) Johnson, John Kefalas, John (I) Kefalas, Troy Miller, Troy (I) Miller, Josh Sheldon, Josh (I) Sheldon, Justin Smith, Justin (I) Smith. (Lowe, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/6/20. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #20 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/22/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Stacy Lynne All parties consent.. (Eldridge, Wade)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/20 GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/20 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 10/28/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Stacy Lynne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Eldridge, Wade)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/20 granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants answers are due on or before 10/6/20. (nmarb, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, and Consolidate Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants David Ayraud, David (I) Ayraud, Tom Donnelly, Tom (I) Donnelly, John Feyen, John (I) Feyen, Steve Johnson, Steve (I) Johnson, John Kefalas, John (I) Kefalas, Troy Miller, Troy (I) Miller, Josh Sheldon, Josh (I) Sheldon, Justin Smith, Justin (I) Smith. (Lowe, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Turner Lowe on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party David Ayraud(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party David (I) Ayraud(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Tom Donnelly(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Tom (I) Donnelly(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party John Feyen(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party John (I) Feyen(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Steve Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Steve (I) Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party John Kefalas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party John (I) Kefalas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Troy Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Troy (I) Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Josh Sheldon(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Josh (I) Sheldon(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Justin Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Justin (I) Smith(pty:dft) (Lowe, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. Justin Smith served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. Josh Sheldon served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. Troy Miller served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. John Kefalas served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. Steve Johnson served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. John Feyen served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. Tom Donnelly served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Lynne. David Ayraud served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eldridge, Wade)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Troy Miller, Josh Sheldon, John Feyen, Tom Donnelly, Steve Johnson, John Kefalas, David Ayraud by Plaintiff Stacy Lynne. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Donnelly, #2 Summons Summons Johnson, #3 Summons Summons Smith, #4 Summons Summons Sheldon, #5 Summons Summons Kefalas, #6 Summons Summons Feyen, #7 Summons Summons Ayraud)(Eldridge, Wade)
August 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/16/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Consent Form due by 10/7/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/14/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. SUMMONSES NOT ISSUED. Summonses submitted have incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summonses for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jsalz, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Ayraud, Tom Donnelly, John Feyen, Steve Johnson, John Kefalas, Troy Miller, Josh Sheldon, Justin Smith (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7434853)Attorney Wade H. Eldridge added to party Stacy Lynne(pty:pla), filed by Stacy Lynne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons Summons Ayraud, #15 Summons Summons Feyen, #16 Summons Summons Kefalas, #17 Summons Summons Sheldon, #18 Summons Summons Smith, #19 Summons Summons Johnson, #20 Summons Summons Donnelly, #21 Summons Summons Miller)(Eldridge, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynne v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Sheldon
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Feyen
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Johnson
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ayraud
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Miller
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh (I) Sheldon
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin (I) Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Feyen
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Donnelly
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy (I) Miller
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve (I) Johnson
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Ayraud
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Kefalas
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Donnelly
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kefalas
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynne
Represented By: Wade H. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?