Robinson et al v. Jefferson County School District R-1 et al
Plaintiff: Casey Robinson and Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association
Defendant: Steve (I) Bell, Steve Bell, Michael (I) Hinz, Greg Jackson, Greg (I) Jackson, Michael Hinz, Jefferson County School District R-1 and Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv02442
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Five day Jury Trial set to commence 1/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 12/9/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/5/20. (jdyne, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/1/20. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 10/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 10/8/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/30/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association, Casey Robinson. (Bradberry, Erik)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02442-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association, Casey Robinson All parties do not consent.. (Bradberry, Erik)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Steve Bell, Steve (I) Bell, Michael Hinz, Michael (I) Hinz, Greg Jackson, Greg (I) Jackson, Jefferson County School District R-1, Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education.(Schreiner, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants, filed by Casey Robinson, Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association.(Bradberry, Erik)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #3 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association, Casey Robinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint Redlined)(Bradberry, Erik)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erik G. Bradberry on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Erik G. Bradberry added to party Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association(pty:pla), Attorney Erik G. Bradberry added to party Casey Robinson(pty:pla) (Bradberry, Erik)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 School District Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading until 9/4/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint, by Defendants Steve Bell, Steve (I) Bell, Michael Hinz, Michael (I) Hinz, Greg Jackson, Greg (I) Jackson, Jefferson County School District R-1, Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Schreiner, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/15/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/1/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due1 0/8/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/14/2020. (jgonz, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against Steve Bell, Steve (I) Bell, Michael Hinz, Michael (I) Hinz, Greg Jackson, Greg (I) Jackson, Jefferson County School District R-1, Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education, filed by Casey Robinson, Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association.(jtorr, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson County School District No. R-1, Greg Jackson, Steve Bell, Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education, Michael Hinz from Jefferson County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2020cv30783. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7436340), filed by Jefferson County School District No. R-1, Greg Jackson, Steve Bell, Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education, Michael Hinz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Jury Trial Demand, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex 3 to State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit State Court Register of Actions, #7 Exhibit State Court Waiver of Service, #8 Exhibit State Court Civil Procedure Order, #9 Exhibit State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Schreiner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Jefferson County School District R-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve (I) Bell
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bell
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Hinz
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jackson
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg (I) Jackson
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hinz
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County School District R-1
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County School District R-1 Board of Education
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Robinson
Represented By: Erik G. Bradberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffco Education Support Professionals Association
Represented By: Erik G. Bradberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?