Freeman v. Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joy FREEMAN
Defendant: Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02449
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10-26-2020 at 9:30am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10-19-2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form #9 is due 10-19-2020. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-24-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/24/2020. (ebuch)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumann, Stephen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Curry Quisenberry on behalf of Joy FreemanAttorney Andrew Curry Quisenberry added to party Joy Freeman(pty:pla) (Quisenberry, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Ashley Webber on behalf of Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (pty:dft) (Webber, Erin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER for Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons upon Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc on 07/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Joy Freeman (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc., filed by Joy Freeman.(cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number COX096092 (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. from Denver District Court, Case Number 20cv032204., filed by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit L)(Baumann, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. Baumann, II
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy FREEMAN
Represented By: Andrew Curry Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?