Kim v. Treasure
Plaintiff: Jordan J. Kim
Defendant: Shauna Treasure
Case Number: 1:2020cv02453
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Shauna Treasure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pratt, Katherine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION for Order to Change Filing Date filed by Defendant Shauna Treasure. (Pratt, Katherine)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/3/2020 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/26/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/1/2020. (jgonz, ) Modified on 10/2/2020 to correct docket text(jgonz, ).
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #11 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 USMS Form 285) (jsalz, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the court has determined that this case does not appear appropriate for summary dismissal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/1/2020. (evana, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shauna Treasure, filed by Jordan J. Kim.(Kim, Jordan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change the Date of Filing to August 13, 2020 by Plaintiff Jordan J. Kim. (rvill, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Shauna TreasureAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Shauna Treasure(pty:dft) (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Pratt, Katherine)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON COURT-APPROVED FORM within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/20/2020. (evana, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shauna Treasure, filed by Jordan J. Kim.(evana, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without PrepayingFees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is granted, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/17/2020.(evana, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED.This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Judge Gordon P. Gallagher.All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02453-GPG.(Text only entry.) (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 DISREGARD-FILED IN ERROR Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, ) Modified on 8/14/2020 To add Filed in Error(cpomm, ).
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jordan J. Kim. (cpomm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against Shauna Treasure, filed by Jordan J. Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Service Waiver)(cpomm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cpomm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Treasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Treasure
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?