Szopinski v. Carlson et al
Plaintiff: Richard J. Szopinski
Defendant: City of Durango, Suzeanne Carlson, Sara Law and Suzanne Carlson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02466
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #11 Order of Dismissal on 10/8/2020. (angar, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. All pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/8/2020. (angar, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Richard J. Szopinski. (athom, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Suzanne Carlson, Sara Law, City of Durango, filed by Richard J. Szopinski. (athom, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail one copy of the following forms to Plaintiff, with applicable instructions: Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Prisoner Complaint, for Plaintiff's use in curing the deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff's Request for Court Appointed Counsel (ECF No. #5 ) is denied without prejudice as premature, because this action is in initial review. If this action is ultimately drawn to a presiding judge, Plaintiff may renew his motion, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/31/2020.(apesa, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint-Supplemental Citation, by Plaintiff Richard J. Szopinski. (apesa, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Richard J. Szopinski. (apesa, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Plaintiff Richard J. Szopinski. (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Prisoner Complaint forms (with the assistance of his case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/2020. (apesa, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Richard J. Szopinski. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against Suzeanne Carlson, City of Durango, Sara Law, filed by Richard J. Szopinski.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szopinski v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Durango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzeanne Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Szopinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?