Torrez v. El Paso County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Torrez
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff's Department, Grace Eastham and Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso
Case Number: 1:2020cv02478
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
2 Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by El Paso County Sheriff's Department, Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso, Grace Eastham. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/15/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso, Grace Eastham, El Paso County Sheriff's Department. (Whitney, Nathan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan James Whitney on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso, Grace Eastham, El Paso County Sheriff's DepartmentAttorney Nathan James Whitney added to party Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan James Whitney added to party Grace Eastham(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan James Whitney added to party El Paso County Sheriff's Department(pty:dft) (Whitney, Nathan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Torrez. Grace Eastham served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (rvill, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Torrez. El Paso County Sheriff's Department served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rvill, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Torrez. Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (rvill, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joseph Torrez. Plaintiff consents. (rvill, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Raymond P. Moore on September 24, 2020. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. #2 ), filed on August 17, 2020, is denied as moot. Plaintiff paid the $400.00 filing fee on September 21, 2020 (ECF No. #6 ). (rvill, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiff appears pro se. The Court strongly encourages Plaintiff to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Plaintiff wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/22/2020. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2478-RM (angar, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number COX096476 (evana, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020.(angar, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph Torrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Counsel)(trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Joseph Torrez. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso, Grace Eastham, El Paso County Sheriff's Department, Deputies John Doe 1-4, filed by Joseph Torrez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrez v. El Paso County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Nathan James Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Eastham
Represented By: Nathan James Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of El Paso
Represented By: Nathan James Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?