Harloff v. Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erick Harloff
Defendant: Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC, Christine Campbell, Jill Hess-Campbell, Lisa Ketterer and Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC doing business as Union Printers Home
Case Number: 1:2020cv02479
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erick Harloff. Lisa Ketterer waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Francis, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erick Harloff. Christine Campbell waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Francis, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erick Harloff. Jill Hess-Campbell waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Francis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC.(Shimonsky, Karen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Heart Living Centers, LLC.(Shimonsky, Karen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC.(Shimonsky, Karen)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/26/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/26/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02479-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Christine Campbell, Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC, Jill Hess-Campbell, Lisa Ketterer All parties do not consent.. (Shimonsky, Karen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jill Hess-Campbell; Christine Campbell; Lise Ketterer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Erick Harloff. (Francis, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Erick Harloff. (Francis, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re #13 Amended Complaint Notice of Filing Exhibits by Plaintiff Erick Harloff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Hess-Campbell, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Campbell)(Francis, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christine Campbell, Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC, Jill Hess-Campbell, Lisa Ketterer, filed by Erick Harloff.(jgonz, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (jgonz, ).
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Erick Harloff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amended Complaint Notated)(Francis, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: No later than 8/24/2020, the parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/20/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Motion to Remand is based on the filing of the #7 Amended Complaint, which has been stricken. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/20/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: The #7 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/20/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Erick Harloff. (Francis, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC, Jill Hess-Campbell, Christine Campbell, Lisa Ketterer Attorney Robert William Francis added to party Erick Harloff(pty:pla), filed by Erick Harloff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Francis, Robert) Modified on 8/20/2020 to strike pursuant to Minute Order #9(jgonz, ).
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC, filed by Erick Harloff.(cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number COX096129 (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2020cv31094. (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Heart Living Centers, LLC, Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC, Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Email message re deadline, #5 Exhibit E - Letters of Administration, #6 Exhibit F - D. Reed Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Docket Sheet)(Shimonsky, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harloff v. Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Harloff
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Living Centers, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Management of Colorado Springs, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Campbell
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Hess-Campbell
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ketterer
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Living Centers of Colorado, LLC doing business as Union Printers Home
Represented By: Karen M. Shimonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?