Citizens for a Healthy Community et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians, High Country Conservation Advocates, Western Watersheds Project, Sierra Club, Citizens for a Healthy Community and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United State Bureau of Land Management, Jamie Connell, Stephanie Connolly, David Bernhardt and Amy Carmichael
Case Number: 1:2020cv02484
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Federal defendant(s) David Bernhardt served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Amy Carmichael served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Jamie Connell served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Stephanie Connolly served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; United State Bureau of Land Management served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Defendants, #2 Affidavit / Proof of Service Upon the U.S. Attorney's Office - District of Colorado, #3 Affidavit / Proof of Service Upon the U.S. Attorney General)(Hornbein, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, David Bernhardt, Jamie Connell, Stephanie Connolly, and Amy Carmichael. No summons issued as to Attorney General of the United States and United States Attorney's Office. (sphil, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/25/2020. (sphil, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, Department of Interior; David Bernhardt, Secretary of Interior; Jamie Connell, Colorado State Director; Stephanie Connolly, District Manager; Amy Carmichael, Field Director re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Interior Secretary Bernhardt, #2 Summons for Jamie Connell, CO State Director, #3 Summons for Stephanie Connelly, District Manager, #4 Summons for Amy Carmichael, Acting Field Manager)(Hornbein, Melissa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text only entry (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7443966)Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party High Country Conservation Advocates(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party Sierra Club(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party Western Watersheds Project(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, High Country Conservation Advocates, CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to civil cover sheet listing counsel of record, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hornbein, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for a Healthy Community et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?