Young v. Weiser
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Phil Weiser
Case Number: 1:2020cv02485
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 USCA Case Number 20-1341 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (rvill, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Huguette Nicole Young to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid, IFP status on appeal denied in final order,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket Sheet)(rvill, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 10th Circuit by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young (Young, Huguette)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #6 Order of Dismissal on September 23, 2020. (rvill, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 23, 2020. (rvill, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Review by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Young v. Superior Court of CA, Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge to 16th Amendment)(Young, Huguette)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is denied without prejudice to being refiled on the court-approved form. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 20, 2020. (rvill, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Opening Brief)(trvo, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Emergency Injunctive Relief against Phil Weiser, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Request, #3 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?