Patton-Curley v. Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Kelly Patton-Curley
Defendant: Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02487
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/13/20. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/7/20. (jdyne, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order and FED. R. EVID. 502(d) ORDER by Plaintiff Kelly Patton-Curley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Wieland, Hollie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kelly Patton-Curley. (Wieland, Hollie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kelly Patton-Curley All parties do not consent.. (Wieland, Hollie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Collins, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Collins, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC.(Collins, Paul)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Emily Young by Emily Young on behalf of Kelly Patton-CurleyAttorney Emily Young added to party Kelly Patton-Curley(pty:pla) (Young, Emily)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Hollie L. Wieland by Hollie Lynn Wieland on behalf of Kelly Patton-CurleyAttorney Hollie Lynn Wieland added to party Kelly Patton-Curley(pty:pla) (Wieland, Hollie)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/19/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul E. Collins on behalf of Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC (Collins, Paul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC, filed by Kelly Patton-Curley.(apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Michelle Getsie on behalf of Bene-Fit Solutions, LLCAttorney Lauren Michelle Getsie added to party Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (Getsie, Lauren)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC from El Paso District Court, Case Number 2020CV31171. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7443983), filed by Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton-Curley v. Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Patton-Curley
Represented By: Hollie Lynn Wieland
Represented By: Emily Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bene-Fit Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Getsie
Represented By: Paul E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?