Priebe v. No Named Defendants
Plaintiff: Colleen J. Priebe
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Case Number: 1:2020cv02491
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 9/29/2020. (sphil, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Complaint and action are dismissed without prejudicepursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with the August 21, 2020 Order, within the time allowed, and for failure to prosecute. ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/29/2020. (sphil, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/21/2020. (sphil, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff Colleen J. Priebe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priebe v. No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen J. Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?