Evanston Insurance Company v. JYP Inc.
Petitioner: Evanston Insurance Company
Respondent: JYP Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02493
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 October 2020. Following an email correspondence from the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for October 21, 2020 is converted to a status conference. The Court will hold the conference at the same time as originally scheduled (1:45 p.m.), in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to #10 Response, in Support of Petition to Appoint Umpire by Petitioner Evanston Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/2/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Evanston Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Fiene, Elayna)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Application,,, by Respondent JYP Inc.Attorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party JYP Inc.(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Burchard, Timothy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. JYP Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Fiene, Elayna)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 DISREGARD, FILED INTO INCORRECT CASE SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) Modified add disregard notice on 8/31/2020 (cmadr, ).
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to JYP, Inc. by Petitioner Evanston Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/21/2020 01:45 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Consent Form due by 10/1/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/14/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. (jgonz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company. (Fiene, Elayna)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Appoint Appraisal Umpire (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7445206)Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:pet), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 part 2, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. JYP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: Elayna M. Fiene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JYP Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Graham Burchard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?