Willis v. Chaffee County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Joshua Burley Mullins, Jason L. Willis and Jason Luther Willis
Defendant: Chaffee County Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv02494
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 8, 2020. This matter is before the court on the notice of change of address (ECF No. #7 ) that indicates Plaintiff has been released from custody. Because Plaintiff no longer is a prisoner, he must file on the court-approved nonprisoner form an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 5, 2020, to file the required nonprisoner motion if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the $400.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is advised that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails either to file a completed nonprisoner motion or pay the filing fee within the time allowed.(Form mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Jason L. Willis (rvill, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Prisoner Complaint Addressed to Jason L. Willis. (rvill, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Jason L. Willis. (rvill, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Chaffee County Detention Center, filed by Jason L. Willis.(rvill, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiffs fail to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 20, 2020. (rvill, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Motion to File COMPLAINT & Lawsuit Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 against Chaffee County Detention Center, filed by Joshua Burley Mullins, Jason L. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Chaffee County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaffee County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Burley Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Luther Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?