Sunburst Homeowners Association, Inc. v. Peng et al
Plaintiff: Sunburst Homeowners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Justin Peng, United States Department of the Treasury, Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession, Su Ryden, Jim Black Construction, Inc. and Sue Sandstrom
Case Number: 1:2020cv02495
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by United States Department of the Treasury.(Bourget, Boris)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket by Defendant United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Docket))(Bourget, Boris)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/1/20 GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Benedict Garcia terminated as counsel of record, and his name to be removed from the electronic certificate of mailing.(nmarb, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Defendant United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Garcia, J.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion forExtension of Time to File Response. Answer due 9/18/2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/27/2020.(jgonz, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Boris Bourget on behalf of United States Department of the Treasury Attorney Boris Bourget added to party United States Department of the Treasury (pty:dft) (Bourget, Boris)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendant United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Garcia, J.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2495-KLM (angar, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against Jim Black Construction, Inc., Justin Peng, Su Ryden, Sue Sandstrom, United States Department of the Treasury, Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession, filed by Sunburst Homeowners Association, Inc..(jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of the Treasury from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31412., filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunburst Homeowners Association, Inc. v. Peng et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Boris Bourget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Ryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Black Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Sandstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunburst Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?