Tennyson v. Dos Santos et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Tennyson
Defendant: Sil Dos Santos, T. Werlick and T. (I) Werlick
Interested Party: CASE MANAGER FOR Audrey Tennyson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02500
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
2 Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 Letter and NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Audrey Tennyson. (rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata re: Misspelled Name of 2nd Defendant, by Plaintiff Audrey Tennyson (apesa, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Audrey Tennyson. Signed by Plaintiff Only. (apesa, ) Modified on 9/10/2020 to correct and add text (athom, ).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 September 2020. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #11 is denied without prejudice with leave to re-file after the case becomes at issue.(cmadr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Audrey Tennyson. Motiom #11 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/1/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Plaintiff Audrey Tennyson. (apesa, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Audrey Tennyson in the amount of $ 164.28; Receipt Number COX096255; Initial Payment. PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE (apesa, )
August 28, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Sil Dos Santos answer due 10/26/2020; T. Werlick answer due 10/26/2020. (apesa, ) Modified on 9/8/2020 (apesa, ) to add correct answer date.
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS upon Sil Dos Santos and T. Werlick. (apesa, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 August 2020. It is ORDERED that a Preliminary Scheduling/Status Conference will be held before this Court on October 29, 2020, at 10:15 a.m., in the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom A-501, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, as indicated by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/27/20. (jdyne, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Prisoner Complaint for Service of Process. (jsalz, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/26/2020. This case is directly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02500-RBJ-MEH. (sphil, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/21/2020, re: #2 the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (order emailed to DOC)(sphil, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Audrey Tennyson. (jsalz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Sil Dos Santos, T. Werlick, T. (I) Werlick, filed by Audrey Tennyson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennyson v. Dos Santos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sil Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Werlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. (I) Werlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CASE MANAGER FOR Audrey Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?