Dorn v. Jefferson County Court et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Dorn
Defendant: Jefferson County Court and City of Denver
Case Number: 1:2020cv02501
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. Plaintiff's motions to consolidate are GRANTED as stated herein; Civil Action No. 20-cv-02501-RM is consolidated with this action (20-cv-2103-RM-KLM) for all purposes; Magistrate Judge Mix shall be the sole referral magistrate judge in this consolidated action; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-02103-RM-KLM; and this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-02501-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on October 7, 2020. (rvill, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter. Upon such review, the Court hereby withdraws the Order Referring Case 67 . SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiff appears pro se. The Court strongly encourages Plaintiff to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Plaintiff wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/29/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/29/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WITHDRAWN - ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/29/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) Modified to withdraw pursuant to 70 Minute Order on 10/6/2020 (rvill, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 66 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #65 . All parties do not consent. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, the case has been directly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02501-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 65 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 9/28/2020. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #58 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Denver. (Klingsporn, Geoffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Jefferson County Court. (Ringel, Andrew)
September 14, 2020 Filing 62 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS to by Plaintiff Thomas J. Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cmadr, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11 September 2020. Before the Court is the Plaintiff's "motion for consolidation" #60 . Plaintiff seeks to consolidate this case with 20-cv-02103-KLM. Upon a review of the docket in 20-cv-02103-KLM, Plaintiff properly filed a motion for consolidation. Accordingly, the Court will construe Plaintiff's filing in this case as a notice of filing and directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate ECF 60 as a motion. (cmadr, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-2501-MEH and 20-cv-2103-KLM by Plaintiff Thomas J. Dorn. (cmadr, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 September 2020. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference currently set on September 21, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to September 28, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. All other aspects of this Court's August 24, 2020 order remain in effect. (cmadr, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 58 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Denver. (Klingsporn, Geoffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Jefferson County Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - unpublished decisions)(Ringel, Andrew)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 August 2020. Before the Court is Defendant Jefferson County Court's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #54 . Because the Court cannot determine what reasonable, good faith efforts were made, Defendant's motion is denied without prejudice.(cmadr, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2020. Status Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jgonz, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Jefferson County Court. (Ringel, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 53 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (sphil, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/21/2020. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02501-MEH. (sphil, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn on behalf of City of DenverAttorney Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn added to party City of Denver(pty:dft) (Klingsporn, Geoffrey)
August 20, 2020 Filing 50 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 49 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01627. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
August 19, 2020 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The City of Denver's motion in the alternative to transfer this matter (D.I. #10 ) is GRANTED and in all other respects is DISMISSED without prejudice to renew. Plaintiff's motion to change venue (D.I. #35 ) is GRANTED. All remaining motions (D.I. #6 , #16 , #18 , #25 , #29 , #33 , #38 , #40 , #44 ) are DISMISSED without prejudice to renew. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/13/2020. (lak) Modified on 8/13/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/13/2020. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Amended Complaint, filed by Jefferson County Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hacker, R.) Modified on 7/28/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 45 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian A. Sullivan regarding Dorn v. Jefferson County Court, et al.. (Sullivan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Amended Complaint, filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(nmg) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 43 Letter to Thomas Dorn, dated 07/09/2020, from Clerk's Office regarding deficient summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 42 Letter from Thomas Dorn, dated 07/05/2020, regarding motion for judgment. (sam) Modified on 7/10/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian A. Sullivan regarding Dorn v. Jefferson County Court, et al.. (Sullivan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 40 Duplicate re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Amend (with signatures), filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 39 Letter Regarding Restraining Orders, filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Injunction Against the Restraining Order Originating Out of Jefferson County Court, filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 37 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Brian A. Sullivan regarding joinder with Defendant's Letter (D.I. #36 ). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 6/19/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from R. Eric Hacker, Esq., regarding response to request for change of venue (D.I. #35 ). (Hacker, R.) Modified on 6/18/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 34 Letter to Thomas J. Dorn, from the Clerk of Court, dated 1/31/2020, regarding noted deficiencies with motion (D.I. #33 ). (amf) Modified on 1/31/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Amend - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (*filing included summons which were not issued and sent to casefile.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amf) Modified on 1/31/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Completion of Briefing, by Jefferson County Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hacker, R.) Modified on 1/15/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 31 Letter to Honorable Judge Andrews, from City and County of Denver, regarding joining in on Letter (D.I. #30 ). (Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 1/14/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from R. Eric Hacker, Esq., regarding Plaintiff's 12/27/2019 and 1/6/2020 submissions. (Hacker, R.) Modified on 1/10/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Discretionary Judgment and for a Court Order to Vacate Restraining Order and Request for Trial - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Jefferson County Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hacker, R.) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to Honorable Judge Andrews, from City and County of Denver regarding Dorn v. Jefferson County Court. (Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 1/2/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Completion of Briefing by City of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 1/2/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas J. Dorn.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2020. (apk) (Main Document 24 replaced on 1/2/2020) (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Remark: Thomas Dorn's address has been updated per D.I. #25 . (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay and to Vacate Restraining Order - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by City of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 12/27/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Support (D.I. #19 ), by Jefferson County Court. (Hacker, R.) Modified on 12/18/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Order (D.I. #18 ) by Jefferson County Court. (Hacker, R.) Modified on 12/18/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 Letter to Thomas J. Dorn from Clerk, dated 12/16/19, regarding request for address verification. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support #18 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Jefferson County Court.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hacker, R.) Modified on 12/15/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Jefferson County Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hacker, R.) Modified on 12/15/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The entry D.I. #17 has been recoded to reflect the filing as an Answering Brief. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION re #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Thomas J. Dorn. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2019. (myr) Modified on 12/12/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Continuance - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from R. Eric Hacker, Esq., regarding response to Motion to Dismiss. (Hacker, R.) Modified on 12/10/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental Certificate of Service by City of Denver. (Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 12/10/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to Thomas J. Dorn, from the Clerk of Court, regarding request for copywork. (sam) Modified on 12/6/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to the Court, from Thomas Dorn, requesting copywork. (sam) Modified on 12/6/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Certificate of Servicve, by City of Denver. (Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 12/2/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by City of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Brian) Modified on 11/26/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
November 22, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: A certificate of service has been added to D.I. #9 . The certificate of service was inadvertently omitted at the initial filing. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Eric Hacker on behalf of Jefferson County Court (Hacker, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas J. Dorn. City of Denver served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019; Jefferson County Court served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons executed)(sam) Modified on 11/21/2019 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to City of Denver on 10/16/2019; Jefferson County Court on 10/16/2019. Summons mailed to plaintiff.(sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT For F.R.Civ.P. 4 filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to produce social security card, passport, and birth certificate - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Remark: Rule 4 mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number DEX032368. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2019. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request/motion to censor Judges in Colorado and New York. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against City of Denver, Jefferson County Court - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Jefferson County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Court
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver
Represented By: Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?