Sawyer v. Russecc et al
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Sawyer
Defendant: Mark Musich, Strive Mesa Developmental Services and Laura Russecc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02505
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on October 14, 2020. Plaintiff's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24 (ECF No. #19 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. In the Order of Dismissal entered September 30, 2020 (ECF No. #15 ), the Court denied Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #17 ) and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #18 ), both filed on October 9, 2020, are STRICKEN because this case is closed. This action was dismissed without prejudice on September 30, 2020, and judgment was entered the same day. (ECF Nos. #15 , #16 ). If Plaintiff wishes to pursue claims in this Court he must file a new action. Any further filings in this closed action will be stricken. (rvill, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (rvill, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 STRICKEN - Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (rvill, ) Modified to Strike pursuant to #20 Minute Order on 10/14/2020 (rvill, ).
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN - COMPLAINT against Mark Musich, Laura Russecc, Strive Mesa Developmental Services, filed by Christopher W. Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rvill, ) Modified to Strike pursuant to #20 Minute Order on 10/14/2020 (rvill, ).
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #15 Order of Dismissal on September 30, 2020. (rvill, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiencies as directed. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 30, 2020. (rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 8, 2020. Plaintiff's motions filed September 4, 2020 (ECF Nos. 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13), which request permission to file an amended pleading in order to add new parties, are denied as unnecessary and duplicative. On August 24, 2020, Plaintiff was ordered to file a cured pleading within thirty days. (ECF No. 6). Plaintiff may name any new parties in his cured pleading. (rvill, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended New parties as Lauren Cotton to case by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to File Leave to File to Compell new parties to case by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Leave to File to Exchange to Add new parties to case by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend New Parties to case by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to add parties to case by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Prisoner Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs., #1 Complaint Addressed to Christopher W. Sawyer. (sphil, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this order the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 24, 2020. (rvill, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (rvill, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Musich, Laura Russecc, Strive Mesa Developmental Services, filed by Christopher W. Sawyer.(rvill, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Christopher W. Sawyer. (trvo, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Musich, Laura Russecc, Strive Mesa Developmental Services, filed by Christopher W. Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Russecc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Musich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strive Mesa Developmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Russecc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?