Swanson v. Milbank Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wesley Swanson
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company An Iowa Foreign Corporation doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Case Number: 1:2020cv02507
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 24 September 2020. (cmadr, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 9/24/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 4/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chad Patrick Hemmat on behalf of Wesley SwansonAttorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Wesley Swanson(pty:pla) (Hemmat, Chad)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Milbank Insurance Company. (Lazar, Cheri)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/8/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02507-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Milbank Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Lazar, Cheri)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cameron Oren Hunter on behalf of Wesley SwansonAttorney Cameron Oren Hunter added to party Wesley Swanson(pty:pla) (Hunter, Cameron)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Glenn Alleman on behalf of Wesley SwansonAttorney Jason Glenn Alleman added to party Wesley Swanson(pty:pla) (Alleman, Jason)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 28 August 2020. Consent Form due by 9/10/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/17/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Milbank Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Milbank Insurance Company on 07/30/2020. (jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Milbank Insurance Company, filed by Wesley Swanson.(jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company d/b/a State Auto Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Milbank Insurance Company d/b/a State Auto Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Milbank Insurance Company d/b/a State Auto Mutual Insurance Company from ARAPAHOE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, Case Number 2020CV031087. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7446976), filed by Milbank Insurance Company d/b/a State Auto Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Henkel, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Milbank Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company An Iowa Foreign Corporation doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Represented By: Cheri R. Lazar
Represented By: Kurt Hans Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Swanson
Represented By: Cameron Oren Hunter
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Jason Glenn Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?