Parker v. Trustwave Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Parker
Defendant: Trustwave Holdings, Inc. and Trustwave Holdings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Aubiron Trustwave
Case Number: 1:2020cv02544
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. (cmadr, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2020. Discovery Deadline: May 4, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: June 24, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 4, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: March 4, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Reid, Steven)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Reid, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Trustwave Holdings, Inc..(Trim, Roger)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. (jgonz, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven R. Reid on behalf of Trustwave Holdings, Inc.Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Trustwave Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reid, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason B. Wesoky and Kylie M. Schmidt by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Dana Parker(pty:pla) (Wesoky, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/25/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon Trustwave Holdings, Inc on 08/03/2020. (jtorr, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Trustwave Holdings, Inc., filed by Dana Parker.(jtorr, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Trim, Roger)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trustwave Holdings, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32523. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7451542), filed by Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Action - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Pretrial Order, #6 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service, #7 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Sanderson, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trim, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Trustwave Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustwave Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustwave Holdings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Aubiron Trustwave
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Parker
Represented By: Jason Bryan Wesoky
Represented By: Kylie Marie Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?