ShapeShift US, Inc. v. Mukhiddinov
Plaintiff: ShapeShift US, Inc.
Defendant: Azamat Mukhiddinov
Case Number: 1:2020cv02591
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #14 on 19 October 2020. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Azamat Mukhiddinov. (Eichner, Kenneth)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff ShapeShift US, Inc.. (Greco, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Azamat Mukhiddinov answer due 10/19/2020, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/5/20.(nmarb, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Azamat Mukhiddinov. (Eichner, Kenneth)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10 September 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint (Dkt. #9 ) is GRANTED finding good cause shown. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before October 8, 2020. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lynn C. Hartfield on behalf of Azamat MukhiddinovAttorney Lynn C. Hartfield added to party Azamat Mukhiddinov(pty:dft) (Hartfield, Lynn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Azamat Mukhiddinov. (Eichner, Kenneth)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Frank Eichner on behalf of Azamat MukhiddinovAttorney Kenneth Frank Eichner added to party Azamat Mukhiddinov(pty:dft) (Eichner, Kenneth)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ShapeShift US, Inc.. Azamat Mukhiddinov served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Greco, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ShapeShift AG for ShapeShift US, Inc.. (Greco, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Ralph Greco on behalf of ShapeShift US, Inc.Attorney Michael Ralph Greco added to party ShapeShift US, Inc.(pty:pla) (Greco, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 26 August 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 27, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form.Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties aredirected to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against AZAMAT MUKHIDDINOV (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7456785)Attorney David Charles Roth added to party SHAPESHIFT US, INC.(pty:pla), filed by SHAPESHIFT US, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Azamat Mukhiddinov, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Roth, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ShapeShift US, Inc. v. Mukhiddinov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ShapeShift US, Inc.
Represented By: David Charles Roth
Represented By: Michael Ralph Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azamat Mukhiddinov
Represented By: Lynn C. Hartfield
Represented By: Kenneth Frank Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?