Kanczes v. City of Greeley et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Kanczes
Defendant: City of Greeley, Weld County, Colorado, Weld County Housing Authority, Tom Teixeria and Housing Authority of the City of Greeley
Case Number: 1:2020cv02593
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint For Defendant Weld County, Colorado by Defendant Weld County, Colorado. Weld County, Colorado answer due 11/30/2020. (Hegarty, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Weld County, Colorado by Matthew Joseph Hegarty on behalf of Weld County, ColoradoAttorney Matthew Joseph Hegarty added to party Weld County, Colorado(pty:dft) (Hegarty, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 21 October 2020. In light of the Status Report on Service of Defendants (Dkt. #7 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for November 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to December 17, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before December 10, 2020, and deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent form is extended up to and including December 3, 2020. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT on Service of Defendants by Plaintiff Danielle Kanczes. (Rheaume, April)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 September 2020. On or before October 27, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #5 ). Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2593-NRN (angar, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Greeley, Housing Authority of the City of Greeley, Tom Teixeria, Weld County Housing Authority, Weld County, Colorado (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7456835)Attorney Joshua J. Sanford added to party Danielle Kanczes(pty:pla), filed by Danielle Kanczes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons -- City of Greeley, #3 Summons Summons -- Weld County, Colorado, #4 Summons Summons -- Housing Authority of the City of Greeley, #5 Summons Summons -- Weld County Housing Authority, #6 Summons Summons -- Tom Teixeria)(Sanford, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanczes v. City of Greeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weld County, Colorado
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Hegarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weld County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Teixeria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Greeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kanczes
Represented By: Joshua J. Sanford
Represented By: April Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?