Crownhart v. McDonalds Corperation et al
Plaintiff: Earl Crownhart
Defendant: James Skinner and McDonalds Corperation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02614
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 RECORD ON APPEAL filed by the the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings. (USCA Case No. 20-01316). Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 23, 2020. Plaintiff's second Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24 (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED as moot and duplicative. (See ECF Nos. #3 , #6 , #9 ). All further such motions will be stricken. (rvill, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (rvill, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 14, 2020. Plaintiff's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24 (ECF No. 6) is DENIED AS MOOT. In the Order of Dismissal entered August 31, 2020 (ECF No. 3), the Court denied Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. (rvill, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 20-1316 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart. (rvill, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, 1915 motion filed, IFP status on appeal denied in final order,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket Sheet)(rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order of Dismissal, and #4 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (rvill, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #3 Order of Dismissal on 08/31/2020. (rvill, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to comply with the sanction order restricting his ability to file pro se actions in this Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on August 31, 2020. (rvill, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against McDonalds Corperation, James Skinner, filed by Earl Crownhart. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crownhart v. McDonalds Corperation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Crownhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds Corperation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?