Sweeney v. Denver Community Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Mark Sweeney
Defendant: Denver Community Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv02617
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/12/2020. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Denver Community Federal Credit Union by Plaintiff Mark Sweeney. (Kersey, Joshua)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #9 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 11/9/2020. Accordingly, all case deadlines are STAYED and the scheduling conference set for 11/12/2020 11:00 AM is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/8/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Mark Sweeney (Kersey, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Denver Community Federal Credit Union answer due 10/15/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 09/21/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Denver Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tehrani, Iman)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Denver Community Federal Credit UnionAttorney Iman Tehrani added to party Denver Community Federal Credit Union(pty:dft) (Tehrani, Iman)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Sweeney. Denver Community Federal Credit Union served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Kersey, Joshua)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/29/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/28/2020. (jgonz, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against DENVER COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7460815)Attorney Joshua R. Kersey added to party MARK SWEENEY(pty:pla), filed by MARK SWEENEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kersey, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney v. Denver Community Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Community Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Iman Tehrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua R. Kersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?