Katt v. WEST LOT LLC
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: West Lot LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02634
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/20/20. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties have filed a Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice #12 . All parties have signed the stipulation and it will be self-effectuating. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff David Katt. (Marcus, Ari)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff David Katt. (Marcus, Ari)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER construing #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond as the Parties' one stipulation for an extension of time pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a). Thus, Defendant's responsive pleading is due 10/27/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/12/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent West Lot Holdings, LLC for West Lot LLC. (Santucci, Nicholas)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant West Lot LLC. (Samsel, Christine)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #6 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant West Lot LLC All parties consent.. (Samsel, Christine)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. West Lot LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/6/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/20/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WEST LOT LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7462590)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. WEST LOT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Lot LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Santucci
Represented By: Christine A. Samsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?