Pioneer Home Solutions LLC v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Plaintiff: Pioneer Home Solutions LLC
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02635
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #19 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/27/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference set November 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on October 27, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Nierenberg, Lily)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. All parties consent.. (Nierenberg, Lily)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nierenberg, Lily)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Home Solutions LLC. (Goodrich, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Nierenberg, Lily)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/10/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/27/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/8/20 GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. answer due by 9/15/2020.(nmarb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Nierenberg, Lily)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich on behalf of Pioneer Home Solutions LLCAttorney Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich added to party Pioneer Home Solutions LLC(pty:pla) (Goodrich, Katherine)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2635-KLM (angar, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Kandace Cecilia Gerdes, Denver County District Court Judge on August 25, 2020. (jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. on 08/03/2020. (jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Pioneer Home Solutions LLC.(jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sandy Marie Eloranto on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.Attorney Sandy Marie Eloranto added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.(pty:dft) (Eloranto, Sandy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Nierenberg, Lily)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32587. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7462667), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nierenberg, Lily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Home Solutions LLC v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Represented By: Lily E. Nierenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Home Solutions LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?