Katt v. Gables Residential Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: Gables Residential Services, Inc. and Continuum Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02636
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #17 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 10/12/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Amended by Defendant Gables Residential Services, Inc.. (Samsel, Christine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice as to Gables Residential Services, Inc. and without prejudice as to Continuum Partners, LLC by Plaintiff David Katt. (Marcus, Ari)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Gables Residential Services, Inc.. (Samsel, Christine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Gables Residential Services, Inc., with Prejudice by Plaintiff David Katt. (Marcus, Ari)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Continuum Partners, LLC, filed by David Katt. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lion Gables Realty LP for Gables Residential Services, Inc.. (Samsel, Christine)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/25/2020. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before 10/15/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Gables Residential Services, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Nicholas Robert Santucci on behalf of Gables Residential Services, Inc. (Santucci, Nicholas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gables Residential Services, Inc.. (Samsel, Christine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. Gables Residential Services, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/2/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 1/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/1/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GABLES RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7462719)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. Gables Residential Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gables Residential Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Santucci
Represented By: Christine A. Samsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continuum Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?