Brito v. Goodman Pine Creek LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Defendant: Back East Bar & Grill Denver, INC., Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, INC., Emans Communitas, LLC., Goodman Pine Creek LLC, Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated, Back East Bar & Grill Denver, Inc and Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02646
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint, MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS BACK EAST BAR & GRILL DENVER, INC., AND LULUS FROZEN YOGURT, INC.S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses. The deadline to file a motion to strike is extended to November 4, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
October 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #22 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/20/2020. (athom, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: #24 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/20/2020. (jgonz, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/20/2020. Discovery due by 4/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2021. (jgonz, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Carlos Brito All parties consent.. (Perez, Anthony)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File; and granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. If Plaintiff seeks to move to strike any portions of the filed Answers (Docket Entry #9 and Docket Entry #10 ), then he shall file such a motion on or before 10/29/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/16/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike)(Perez, Anthony)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE re #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES NOTICE OF STRIKING [DOC 17] by Plaintiff Carlos Brito (Perez, Anthony)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike)(Perez, Anthony)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) on Motion for Extension of Time to File MTS)(Perez, Anthony)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Defendant Emans Communitas, LLC. (Weeks, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Weeks, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Emans Communitas, LLC.(pty:dft) by Emans Communitas, LLC..(Weeks, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Goodman Pine Creek LLC(pty:dft) by Goodman Pine Creek LLC.(Vail, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Goodman Pine Creek LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Emans Communitas, LLC. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Back East Bar & Grill Denver, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, Inc(pty:dft) by Back East Bar & Grill Denver, Inc, Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, Inc.(Vail, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jason (J. W.) Wayne Downie added to party Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated(pty:dft) by Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated.(Downie, Jason (J. W.))
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Back East Bar & Grill Denver, INC. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, INC. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/19/2020 (jgonz, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/1/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Back East Bar & Grill Denver, INC., Emans Communitas, LLC., Goodman Pine Creek LLC, Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, INC., Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7464170)Attorney Anthony J. Perez added to party Carlos Brito(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. Goodman Pine Creek LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Anthony J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back East Bar & Grill Denver, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emans Communitas, LLC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lenn Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Pine Creek LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Restaurant Group, Incorporated
Represented By: Jason (J. W.) Wayne Downie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back East Bar & Grill Denver, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lulu's Frozen Yogurt, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?