Human Rights Defense Center v. Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Richard (I) Reigenborn, Chris Laws and Richard Reigenborn
Case Number: 1:2020cv02665
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 COURTROOM MINUTES for Preliminary Injunction Hearing via Video Teleconference held before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/28/2020. With the agreement of the parties, this hearing is continued indefinitely. The parties shall notify the Court if they want to reschedule the hearing. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 is postponed indefinitely. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (ebuch)
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kasandra R. Carleton on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) ReigenbornAttorney Kasandra R. Carleton added to party Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Kasandra R. Carleton added to party Chris Laws(pty:dft), Attorney Kasandra R. Carleton added to party Richard Reigenborn(pty:dft), Attorney Kasandra R. Carleton added to party Richard (I) Reigenborn(pty:dft) (Carleton, Kasandra)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Paul Wright)(Thornton, J.)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. The preliminary injunction hearing is set for Wednesday, October 28, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. via VTC before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The parties shall exchange with each other, and submit to the Court electronically, their exhibits on or before October 26, 2020 at 5:00 p.m.. Plaintiff may file a reply, not to exceed 10 pages, by October 23, 2020. ORDERED by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/21/2020. (angar, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 20 Witness List by Defendants Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn. (Booth, Kerri)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 Witness List by Plaintiff Human Rights Defense Center. (Thornton, J.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric J. Taylor on behalf of Human Rights Defense CenterAttorney Eric J. Taylor added to party Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla) (Taylor, Eric)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/13/2020 re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. ORDERED that, in order for the Court to determine the appropriate length of the preliminary injunction hearing, plaintiff shall file a witness list by Thursday, October 15, 2020 using the form found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonPhilipABrimmer.aspx, indicating the witnesses it intends to call at the preliminary injunction hearing and the length of its direct examinations. ORDERED that defendants shall file by Monday, October 19, 2020, a witness list for the preliminary injunction hearing, which shall include estimates of the time required for cross-examining plaintiffs witnesses and estimates of time for conducting the direct examination of defendants witnesses. ORDERED that counsel shall jointly contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2794) on Wednesday, October 21, 2020 to schedule a preliminary injunction hearing. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn. (Booth, Kerri)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Marshall on behalf of Human Rights Defense CenterAttorney Daniel Marshall added to party Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla) (Marshall, Daniel)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn.(Booth, Kerri)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/7/2020 re: #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants shall respond to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before October 9, 2020. For future requests for extension of time, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to I.G.2 of this Court's Practice Standards, "[a]ny motion for extension of time shall be filed no later than three business days before the date the motion, response, reply, or other paper is due." Also, the conferral requirement is not met by leaving a message with opposing counsel. The Local Rule requires that the parties actually confer before filing a motion. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn. (Booth, Kerri)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/23/2020. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 on or before October 7, 2020. Once defendants have filed their response, the Court will notify the parties regarding any scheduling of a preliminary injunction hearing. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/23/2020 re: #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer/response to the complaint on or before October 9, 2020. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn. (Booth, Kerri)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Human Rights Defense Center. Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Chris Laws served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Richard Reigenborn served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thornton, J.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02665-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2020. The above-captioned case was directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Soon after filing its Complaint, Plaintiff filed a motion for preliminary injunction (ECF #5 ). Pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a), "a civil action in which a motion for injunctive relief is filed" shall not be assigned directly to a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (cmadr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Wright)(Thornton, J.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Thornton, J.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons issued (cpomm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado, DOES 1 through 10, Chris Laws, Richard Reigenborn (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7465548)Attorney J. Matt Thornton added to party Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla), filed by Human Rights Defense Center.(Thornton, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Defense Center v. Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Adams County Colorado
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Represented By: Kasandra R. Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Reigenborn
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Represented By: Kasandra R. Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Laws
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Represented By: Kasandra R. Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Reigenborn
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Represented By: Kasandra R. Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: J. Matt Thornton
Represented By: Daniel Marshall
Represented By: Eric J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?