Katt v. Nava Real Estate Development, LLC
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: Neva Real Estate Development, LLC and Nava Real Estate Development, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02667
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/12/2020. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff David Katt (Marcus, Ari)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. Nava Real Estate Development, LLC served on 9/20/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/29/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/1/2020. (jgonz, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NAVA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7465758)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. Nava Real Estate Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neva Real Estate Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nava Real Estate Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?