Katt v. GS Victor, LP
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: GS Victor, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02668
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant GS Victor, LP. (Torgersen, Eric)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 11/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Neureiter is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 10/29/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/26/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2668-RBJ (angar, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02668-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant GS Victor, LP All parties do not consent.. (Torgersen, Eric)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by GS Victor, LP.(Torgersen, Eric)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 October 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED for good cause shown.The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 22, 2020. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant GS Victor, LP. (Torgersen, Eric)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Edward Torgersen on behalf of GS Victor, LP Attorney Eric Edward Torgersen added to party GS Victor, LP (pty:dft) (Torgersen, Eric)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dennis Boyd Polk on behalf of GS Victor, LP Attorney Dennis Boyd Polk added to party GS Victor, LP (pty:dft) (Polk, Dennis)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. GS Victor, LP served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 September 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 22, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #3-1).Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter.The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GS VICTOR, LP (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7465800)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. GS Victor, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Victor, LP
Represented By: Eric Edward Torgersen
Represented By: Dennis Boyd Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?