Brito v. Truong et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Defendant: Tony M Truong, Migliore Gusto LLC and Hien T Van
Case Number: 1:2020cv02680
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS TONY M TRUONG AND HIEN T VANS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2020. (jgonz, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2020. Discovery due by 5/25/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2021. (jgonz, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/27/2020. Pursuant to #15 , this case is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02680-KMT. (sphil, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Carlos Brito All parties consent.. (Perez, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/15/2020 granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. For future requests for extension of time, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to I.G.2 of this Court's Practice Standards, "[a]ny motion for extension of time shall be filed no later than three business days before the date the motion, response, reply, or other paper is due." Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike)(Perez, Anthony)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Defendant Migliore Gusto LLC (Weeks, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Weeks, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Migliore Gusto LLC(pty:dft) by Migliore Gusto LLC.(Weeks, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Hien T Van served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Tony M Truong served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Migliore Gusto LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Tony M Truong(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Hien T Van(pty:dft) by Tony M Truong, Hien T Van.(Vail, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2020 (jgonz, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoyafor non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony M Truong (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7469088)Attorney Anthony J. Perez added to party Carlos Brito(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. Truong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony M Truong
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Migliore Gusto LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lenn Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hien T Van
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Anthony J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?