Brito v. CRE Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Defendant: CRE Holdings, LLC, Gas Light Inc. and Las Americas Restaurant Corp
Case Number: 1:2020cv02685
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/27/2020. Consent Form due by 12/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/14/2020 (evaug)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Conduct Rule 26(f) Meeting. The deadlines are vacated and will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/27/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Perez, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Las Americas Restaurant Corp served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. CRE Holdings, LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Consent Form due by 10/26/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2020 (jgonz, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRE Holdings, LLC, Gas Light Inc., Las Americas Restaurant Corp (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7470872)Attorney Anthony J. Perez added to party Carlos Brito(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. CRE Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Anthony J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRE Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gas Light Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Americas Restaurant Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?