Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18 et al
Plaintiff: Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE, DTW1991, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18, Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer Underwriting and Antares AUL 1274
Case Number: 1:2020cv02697
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by email by Clerk of Court re #14 Order to cheryl.layne@judicial.state.co.us. (sgrim)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service by email by Clerk of Court re #14 Order to sabra.millett@judicial.state.co.us. (sgrim)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/23/2020, re: #13 Response to Order to Show Cause. ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the District Court of Douglas County, Colorado, where it was originally filed as Case No. 2020CV30543. ORDERED that this case is closed. (sphil, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 by Defendants Antares AUL 1274, Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18, DTW1991, HDI Global Specialty SE, Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer UnderwritingAttorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Antares AUL 1274(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18 (pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party DTW1991(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer Underwriting(pty:dft). (Collier, Jessica)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The.(Fitzpatrick, Joshua) Modified on 9/21/2020 to add linkage. (sphil, ).
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Brian Fitzpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joshua Brian Fitzpatrick added to party Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The(pty:pla) (Fitzpatrick, Joshua)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/8/2020. ORDERED that, on or before September 22, 2020, HDI shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Antares AUL 1274, Catlin Via Chesterfield XLC 2003, DTW 1991 c/o Mendes & Mount, Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18 on 07/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Delay Reduction Order upon HDI Global Specialty SE on 08/06/2020, filed by Plaintiff Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The. (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Antares AUL 1274, Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18, DTW1991, HDI Global Specialty SE, Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer Underwriting, filed by Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The.(jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents in Entry #1 shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent to Removal by Defendants Antares AUL 1274, Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. GEP10562-18, DTW1991, Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer Underwriting (Collier, Jessica)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HDI Global Specialty SE f/k/a International Insurance Company of Hannover SE from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30543. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7472910), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE f/k/a International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Returns of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service - HDI, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Cover, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket & Pleadings, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Removal - State, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collier, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTW1991
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin via Chesterfield XLC 2003
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number GEP10562-18
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Syndicate LIB 4472 via Pioneer Underwriting
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antares AUL 1274
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highlands at Stonegate North Condominium Association, The
Represented By: Joshua Brian Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?