Cox v. Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sealiena Cox
Defendant: Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc., Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc. and Galyan's Trading Company LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02706
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2020. (jgonz, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2020. Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (jgonz, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order submitted on behalf of both parties by Plaintiff Sealiena Cox. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form Do not consent)(Earl, Collin)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc..(Jennings, Rachel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Clean against Galyan's Trading Company LLC, filed by Sealiena Cox.(Earl, Collin)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the [13-1] Amended Complaint, on or before September 14, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/11/20. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #6 Complaint by Plaintiff Sealiena Cox (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint Redlined)(Earl, Collin)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2020 (jgonz, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/8/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Sealiena CoxAttorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Sealiena Cox(pty:pla) (Earl, Collin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Two-Week Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Plaintiff Sealiena Cox. (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Summons and Cover Sheet upon Galyan's Trading Company LLC on 6th August 2020, filed by Plaintiff Sealiena Cox (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Galyan's Trading Company LLC, filed by Sealiena Cox.(jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katie Berit Johnson on behalf of Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Katie Berit Johnson added to party Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Johnson, Katie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jennings, Rachel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc. from Pueblo County District Court, Case Number 2020CV030350. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7473973), filed by Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaitn, #2 Exhibit B - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Order Re 16.1, #5 Exhibit E - State Return of Service, #6 Exhibit F - State Unopposed Motion Extension Resp. Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - State Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion Respond to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - State Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Respond to Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Colo. Sec State Docs, #10 Exhibit J - Affidavit Katie B. Johnson, #11 Exhibit K - State Notice of Intent to Remove, #12 Exhibit L - State Register of Actions, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylan's Trading Company LLC DBA Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Rachel Truman Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Rachel Truman Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galyan's Trading Company LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Rachel Truman Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sealiena Cox
Represented By: Collin Joseph Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?