Christensen v. Smith
Petitioner: Mikkel Gavin Christensen
Respondent: Skye Sarah Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv02763
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT and Request for Forthwith Hearing by Petitioner Mikkel Gavin Christensen. (Frost, Leslie)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/30/2020. The portion of the Respondent's Response to the Petition for the Immediate Return of the Minor Children to Denmark [Docket No. #6 ] that requests a stay is DENIED for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), which requires that "[a] motion shall be filed as a separate document," and for failure to address the factors in Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). See also Chafin v. Chafin, 568 U.S. 165, 178 (2013). Petitioner is ORDERED to file a brief, on or before November 4, 2020, addressing: (i) whether the parties are participating in a custody hearing on November 12, 2020 in Denmark, (ii) whether the parties are participating in mediation, and (iii) the likelihood of the parties resolving the case through those efforts, or whether the court should set a hearing in this case. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Courtney Jennifer Leathers Allen added to party Skye Sarah Smith(pty:res) by Skye Sarah Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Custody Hearing and Court Deadlines in Denmark, #2 Exhibit Fall conferences Report for T.C.C.)(Allen, Courtney Jennifer)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Petitioner Mikkel Gavin Christensen (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Frost, Leslie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Petition for the Immediate Return of the Minor Children to Denmark Pursuant to 22 U.S.C. 9001, et seq. and the Hague Convention of 25 October 1980 on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, filed by attorney Leslie Anne Frost. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). ADDITIONALLY, attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for the Immediate Return of the Minor Children to Denmark Pursuant to 22 U.S.C. 9001, et seq. and the Hague Convention of 25 October 1980 on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7483482)Attorney Leslie Anne Frost added to party Mikkel Gavin Christensen(pty:pet), filed by Mikkel Gavin Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, TCC Birth Certificate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, EDC Birth Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Court Order translated and apostilled, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Proposed Summons)(Frost, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mikkel Gavin Christensen
Represented By: Leslie Anne Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Skye Sarah Smith
Represented By: Courtney Jennifer Leathers Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?